Kansas City Investment, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kansas City Investment, LLC
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02603
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER finding as moot defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ). Defendant's motion seeks dismissal of one claim asserted in plaintiff's original Petition (Doc. 1-1), which defendant removed from the District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas to our court (Doc. 1). Plaintiff since has filed a First Amended Complaint with the court's leave under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) (Doc. 20). Thus, defendant's Motion to Dismiss one count asserted in the original Petition is moot. The court denies defendant's motion (Doc. 9) as moot but without prejudice to filing any future motion addressing plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 02/24/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
February 24, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Kansas City Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - United Claims Service Estimate, #3 Exhibit C - Engineering Perspective Report, #4 Exhibit D - Insurance Adjusters Group Estimate)(Kenney, William) Modified on 2/24/2022 to correct who complaint filed against (ca).
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. As discussed in the parties' Scheduling Conference, Plaintiff has filed a motion to amend, in part to address Defendant's #9 motion to dismiss and in part to name the correct party as Defendant. Defendant consents. The Court finds good cause for allowing amendment, and Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/24/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
February 23, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Kansas City Investment, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract)(Kenney, William)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held by telephone on 2/23/2022. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
February 16, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Kansas City Investment, LLC. (Kenney, William)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Owners Insurance Company's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mackay, Derek)
February 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Subpoena to Non-Party for Production of Documents and Things Pursuant t Rule 45(a)(4) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Mackay, Derek)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Clark L. Jones for Kansas City Investment, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/31/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)
January 30, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Clark L. Jones to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5699379.) by Plaintiff Kansas City Investment, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Kenney, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set by telephone for 2/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. To join the call, counsel shall dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/2/2022. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 1/11/22. (ct)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company(Mackay, Derek)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mackay, Derek)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Mackay, Derek)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of (Proof of Service Pursuant to Rule 81.1) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mackay, Derek)
December 28, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of (Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Mackay, Derek)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County District Court. (Mackay, Derek)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Mackay, Derek)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mackay, Derek)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Mackay, Derek)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2021-CV-000665 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-5671443.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mackay, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kansas City Investment, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Investment, LLC
Represented By: Clark L. Jones
Represented By: William Charles Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek H. Mackay
Represented By: Jonathan Morrow
Represented By: Patrick J. Allegri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?