Gilmore v. Bravo (Leawood), LLC
Plaintiff: Alex Gilmore
Defendant: Bravo (Leawood), LLC doing business as Bravo! Italian Restaurant
Case Number: 2:2022cv02164
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration. The parties are to conduct arbitration in accordance with their agreement and to notify the court of the outcome. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/2/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: based on the Joint Motion to Stay Proceeding, Doc. 8, the Court is finding as moot #4 Motion to Compel Arbitration; finding as moot #4 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/2/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Defendant Bravo (Leawood), LLC. (Stanley, Jordon)
June 1, 2022 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(bh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Reply. For good cause shown, the Court grants the motion. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before June 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 5/31/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Bravo (Leawood), LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Stanley, Jordon)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Bravo (Leawood), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alternative Dispute Policy, #2 Exhibit Mutual Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit Handbook)(Stanley, Jordon)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION by Defendant Bravo (Leawood), LLC. (Stanley, Jordon). Added Motion to Stay on 5/27/2022. (mam)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bravo (Leawood), LLC identifying BBR Holdings, LLC and FoodFirst Global, L.P. as corporate parents. (Stanley, Jordon)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jordon T. Stanley on behalf of Bravo (Leawood), LLC. (Stanley, Jordon)
May 4, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
May 4, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bravo (Leawood), LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5771865.), filed by Alex Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A-EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Bravo (Leawood), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Gilmore
Represented By: Lauren Perkins Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravo (Leawood), LLC doing business as Bravo! Italian Restaurant
Represented By: Jordon T. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?