Martley v. Basehor, Kansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Martley
Defendant: Basehor, Kansas, City of, Intact Insurance Group USA LLC doing business as Intact Insurance Specialty Solutions and Intact Services USA LLC, David Breuer, Leslee Rivarola, Michelle Stewart, Terelle Mock, David Cooper and Shannon Marcano
Case Number: 2:2022cv02169
Filed: May 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. Leslee Rivarola waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. David Breuer waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. Basehor, Kansas, City of waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
June 21, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Basehor, Kansas, City of, David Breuer, Leslee Rivarola. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. Terelle Mock waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. David Cooper waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of the Service of Summons by Defendant Intact Insurance Group USA LLC. Served 5/18/2022. Answer due 7/18/2022. (Schultz, John) Modified on 6/13/2022 to show service/answer due dates as wrong event used when filed (ca).
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER of the Service of Summons by Defendant Michelle Stewart. (Schultz, John) Party served 5/18/2022. Answer due 7/18/2022. Modified on 6/13/2022 to show service/answer due dates as wrong event used when filed (ca).
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lloyd Martley. Shannon Marcano waiver sent on 5/18/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (Reavey, Patrick)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John G. Schultz on behalf of Intact Insurance Group USA LLC, Michelle Stewart. (Schultz, John)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [to fix errors in Paragraphs 22,42,43, and 150] against All Defendants, filed by Lloyd Martley. (Reavey, Patrick)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lloyd Martley. (lb)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5775225.), filed by Lloyd Martley.(Reavey, Patrick)
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martley v. Basehor, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Martley
Represented By: Patrick G. Reavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basehor, Kansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intact Insurance Group USA LLC doing business as Intact Insurance Specialty Solutions and Intact Services USA LLC
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslee Rivarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Stewart
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terelle Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Marcano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?