Leonard v. HMG Park Manor of Salina, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Keyna Leonard
Defendant: HMG Park Manor of Salina, LLC doing business as Smoky Hill Rehabilitation Center, Healthmark Group, LTD, HMG Healthcare LLC and HMG Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02267
Filed: July 9, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court therefore orders Plaintiffs to show cause in writing to the Magistrate Judge by 9/16/2022, why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend that the District Judge dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendants for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/1/2022. (mam)
August 10, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Keyna Leonard upon All Defendants. All defendants served on 7/21/2022, answer due 8/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Notice of Service Ex. A)(Steele, Jonathan) Modified on 8/15/2022 to include service/answer dates. (mam)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding #6 Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. On July 19, 2022, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend dismissal of this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction because the complaint failed to allege diversity of citizenship. Plaintiffs' response to the show-cause order and the new citizenship allegations in the amended complaint sufficiently address the jurisdictional concerns raised in the Court's show-cause order regarding the citizenship of the parties. For this reason, the Magistrate Judge will not recommend dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 7/28/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jrh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Keyna Leonard, Keyna Leonard(Steele, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keyna Leonard(as the surviving daughter of decedent), Keyna Leonard(Administrator of the estate of).(Steele, Jonathan)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 7/19/2022. (kas)
July 11, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
July 11, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HMG Healthcare LLC, HMG Park Manor of Salina, LLC, HMG Services, LLC, Healthmark Group, LTD. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
July 9, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Kenya Leonard. (Steele, Jonathan)
July 9, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Kenya Leonard - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
July 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5819183.), filed by Kenya Leonard.(Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. HMG Park Manor of Salina, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyna Leonard
Represented By: Kevin L. Chaffee
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG Park Manor of Salina, LLC doing business as Smoky Hill Rehabilitation Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthmark Group, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?