George v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly George
Defendant: Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department, Wellpath, LLC, Danny K. Stanton and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2022cv02309
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kimberly George re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Brady, James)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 6/29/2022. (ca)
September 23, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wellpath, LLC(Hayes, Tracy)
September 23, 2022 Filing 18 (DISREGARD, wrong document attached; see #19 for the corrected filing.) -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wellpath, LLC. (Hayes, Tracy) Modified on 9/27/2022, this is a duplicate of #17 . (mam)
September 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Wellpath, LLC (Hayes, Tracy) Modified on 9/23/2022 to correct filers(kas).
September 20, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Danny K. Stanton(Hayes, Tracy)
September 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Danny K. Stanton (Hayes, Tracy)
September 19, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Kimberly George re #11 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Brady, James)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding #8 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. In light of the #11 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Defendants, the Court suspends the scheduling conference and the deadlines in the Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. The Court will reset these deadlines and the scheduling conference in a separate order after resolution of the motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding #11 Defendants Wyandotte County Sheriff and Unified Government's Motion to Stay Discovery. If Plaintiff Kimberly George and/or Defendants Well Path, LLC and Danny K. Stanton do not oppose the motion, they shall notify Magistrate Judge's chambers by sending an email to ksd_schwartz_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov on or before September 16, 2022. If any of these parties oppose the motion, they shall file response brief(s) on or before September 20, 2022. Each brief is limited to four double-spaced pages. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the relief requested, no reply brief is allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
September 13, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Cole, Joni)
September 12, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department(Cole, Joni)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department (Cole, Joni)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for October 5, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline: 9/14/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline: 9/23/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline: 9/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 09/06/2022. (drk)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/21/2022 for Defendant Danny K. Stanton to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/2/2022. (ada)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/4/2022 for Defendant Wellpath, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/2/2022. (ada)
August 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/12/2022 for Defendants Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department, Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/25/2022. (jk)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Joni S. Cole on behalf of Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department. (Cole, Joni)
August 8, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jane Doe, Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas, Danny K. Stanton, Wellpath, LLC, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
August 5, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Kimberly George - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brady, James)
August 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kimberly George. (Brady, James)
August 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5839181.), filed by Kimberly George.(Brady, James)
August 5, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly George
Represented By: James E. Brady, III
Represented By: James M. Roswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government of Wyandotte County Kansas City, Kansas
Represented By: Joni S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Joni S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Tracy M. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny K. Stanton
Represented By: Tracy M. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?