Finley v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Finley
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc. doing business as Garden Terrace at Overland Park
Case Number: 2:2022cv02323
Filed: August 16, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLTF RULE 26 DESIGNATIONS by David Finley. (Fatall, George)
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Care Centers of America, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Denning, William)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/23/22. (ala)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Life Care Centers of America, Inc..(Denning, William)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (Denning, William)
August 16, 2022 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Life Care Center of America, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Denning, William)
August 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 22CV03523, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5846185.), filed by Life Care Centers of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Denning, William)
August 16, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Finley
Represented By: George Michael Fatall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc. doing business as Garden Terrace at Overland Park
Represented By: William P. Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?