Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02360
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephone KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 11/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10-31-22. (cc)
October 31, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC identifying None as corporate parent. (Brigg, John)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John M. Brigg on behalf of Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC. (Brigg, John)
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC.(Crawford, William)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to file answer or response to Plaintiff Auto Owners' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Answer or responsive pleading due on or before October 31, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/29/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file responsive pleading by Defendant Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Crawford, William)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William Clayton Crawford on behalf of Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC. (Crawford, William)
September 12, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 9, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Auto-Owners Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Morrow, Jonathan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Auto-Owners Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Morrow, Jonathan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Morrow, Jonathan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5864427.), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Morrow, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Morrow
Represented By: Patrick J. Allegri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelsior Westbrook III, LLC
Represented By: John M. Brigg
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?