Hummell v. MV Realty of Kansas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark Hummell
Defendant: MV Realty of Kansas LLC and MV Realty PBC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02383
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehic
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 14 REMAND Letter to Johnson County District Court (msb) (Certified Mail receipt #7020 3160 0000 9283 4601)
October 25, 2022 Filing 13 JUDGMENT ENTERED: Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order filed on October 25, 2022, Doc. 12, the case is remanded to the District Court of Johnson County, Kansas and defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,Doc. 5, is denied as moot. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/25/22. (msb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The case is remanded to the District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is denied as moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/25/22. (msb)
October 19, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Defendants MV Realty PBC, LLC, MV Realty of Kansas LLC re #8 Order to Show Cause. (Yocum, Rebecca)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or File an Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(B) with Memorandum in Support. Response deadline 11/4/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/18/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
October 18, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or File an Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1)(B) with Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Mark Hummell (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Corl, Brandon)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Defendant to show cause in writing to the Magistrate Judge by October 19, 2022, why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend that the District Judge remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/5/2022. (kas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Mark Hummell - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Corl, Brandon)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants MV Realty PBC, LLC, MV Realty of Kansas LLC. (Yocum, Rebecca)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants MV Realty PBC, LLC, MV Realty of Kansas LLC. (Yocum, Rebecca)
September 26, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant MV Realty of Kansas LLC served on 8/31/2022. (Originally filed in the Johnson County District Court on 9/19/2022.) (mam)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant MV Realty PBC, LLC served on 9/1/2022. (Originally filed in the Johnson County District Court on 9/19/2022.)(mam)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants MV Realty PBC, LLC, MV Realty of Kansas LLC. (Yocum, Rebecca)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 22CV04363, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5875017.), filed by MV Realty PBC, LLC, MV Realty of Kansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yocum, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hummell v. MV Realty of Kansas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hummell
Represented By: Anne W. Schiavone
Represented By: Brandon L. Corl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Realty of Kansas LLC
Represented By: Rebecca S. Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Realty PBC, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca S. Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?