Hoyt v. USD 234 Fort Scott et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Hoyt
Defendant: USD 234 Fort Scott, Ted Hessong and Gina Shelton
Case Number: 2:2022cv02387
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Gina Shelton, USD 234 Fort Scott re: #10 Motion to Dismiss (Goheen, Gregory)
November 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Demand for Jury Trial by Michael J. Hoyt (Hoyt, Michael)
November 3, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #13 Response to Motion. Originally filed as a Response to Motion, the docket text is corrected to reflect the entry as a Notice of No Objection to Removal of the case. (ca)
November 1, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Hoyt, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION TO REMOVAL by Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt (Hoyt, Michael) Modified on 11/3/2022 title and docket entry relationship (ca).
October 17, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt is a registered pro se participant with E-Filing & ECF Notifications. (gw)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Before the court is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10). Plaintiff's response to the motion is due on or before 11/1/2022. If Plaintiff fails to timely respond, the Court will likely take up the motion without the benefit of his response. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/12/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 11, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Gina Shelton, USD 234 Fort Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goheen, Gregory)
October 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gina Shelton, USD 234 Fort Scott. (Goheen, Gregory)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant Gina Shelton served on 9/6/2022. (Originally filed in the Bourbon County District Court on 9/12/2022.) (mam)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Defendant Ted Hessong. (Originally filed in the Bourbon County District Court on 9/12/2022.) (mam)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant USD 234 Fort Scott served on 9/6/2022. (Originally filed in the Bourbon County District Court on 9/12/2022.) (mam)
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Bourbon County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Goheen, Gregory)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/11/2022 for Defendants Gina Shelton, USD 234 Fort Scott to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/27/2022. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt at P.O. Box 1009, Fort Scott, KS 66701 by regular mail. (jk)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by USD 234 Fort Scott, Gina Shelton. (Goheen, Gregory)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Gina Shelton, USD No. 234 Fort Scott. (Goheen, Gregory)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bourbon County District Court, case number BB-2022-CV-000141, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5877115.), filed by Gina Shelton, USD 234 Fort Scott. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition)(Goheen, Gregory)
September 27, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Michael J. Hoyt at P.O. Box 1009, Fort Scott, KS 66701 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. USD 234 Fort Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 234 Fort Scott
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Hessong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Shelton
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?