Owolabi et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Olamilekam A. Owolabi and Jumoke Khadijat Abass
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Terri Robinson
Case Number: 2:2022cv02404
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Toby Crouse
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/03/2023 for Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Terri Robinson to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/25/2022. (jk)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/18/2022 Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022; Terri Robinson served on 10/13/2022, answer due 12/12/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/18/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS RECEIPTS)(Hacking, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Jumoke Khadijat Abass, Olamilekam A. Owolabi - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hacking, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Jumoke Khadijat Abass, Olamilekam A. Owolabi. (Hacking, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5885460.), filed by Olamilekam A. Owolabi, Jumoke Khadijat Abass.(Hacking, James)
October 7, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
October 7, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Terri Robinson, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owolabi et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olamilekam A. Owolabi
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jumoke Khadijat Abass
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Robinson
Represented By: Steven W. Brookreson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?