Logan v. Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tyler Logan
Defendant: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv02465
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 7/7/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for July 26, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Dispositive motion deadline 8/9/2023. See order for additional deadlines. The court will subsequently set this case for trial. Estimated trial time - 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 01/11/2023. (drk)
January 11, 2023 Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 1/11/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (drk)
January 5, 2023 Filing 25 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company re: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stanley, Jordon)
December 30, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures by Tyler Logan. (Meany, Daniel)
December 30, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant FNWL's Rule 26 Disclosures by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 12/22/22. (bh)
December 22, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company re: #14 Motion to Stay Discovery (Stanley, Jordon)
December 21, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Tyler Logan re #14 Motion to Stay Discovery (Meany, Daniel)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Resetting the Briefing Schedule on 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay. At the request of the Plaintiff today via email, the Court extends the time for Plaintiff to respond to the Motion. Plaintiff's response brief is due at or before 4:00 p.m. today, December 21, 2022. The page limitations previously imposed in the Court's prior order (ECF No. 15) still apply. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the relief requested, the deadline for Defendant to file a reply brief remains December 22, 2022, but the time is extended to 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 2/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Reply deadline is on or before 1/6/2023. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Stanley, Jordon)
December 19, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Tyler Logan re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Friesen, Benjamin)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding #14 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. The Court expedites briefing on the motion. If Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, he shall notify the Magistrate Judge's chambers via email at ksd_schwartz_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov on or before December 19, 2022. If Plaintiff opposes the motion, his response is due on or before 5:00 p.m. on December 20, 2022. The brief is limited to four double-spaced pages. Defendant's reply brief is due on or before noon on December 22, 2022, and is limited to two double-spaced pages. Additionally, the parties are put on notice that the deadlines and scheduling conference set out in the #9 Initial Order still apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 12/16/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
December 16, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Discovery re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Stanley, Jordon)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Response deadline is on or before 12/19/2022. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
December 8, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Tyler Logan (Meany, Daniel)
December 8, 2022 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #12 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(bh)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for January 11, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/16/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/30/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 12/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 11/18/2022. (drk)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James C. Morris on behalf of Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Morris, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Jordon T. Stanley on behalf of Farmers New World Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Notice of Removal incl Exs)(Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company identifying Farmers Group Inc. as corporate parent . (Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jordon T. Stanley on behalf of Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 DISREGARD. WRONG DOCUMENT FILED. CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Stanley, Jordon) Modified on 11/15/2022 (ca).
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 22CV05224, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5913030.), filed by Farmers New World Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit EX B - State Court Case File, #3 Exhibit EX C - Notice of Removal to State Court)(Stanley, Jordon)
November 14, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Logan v. Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Logan
Represented By: Benjamin Tyler Friesen
Represented By: Daniel Meany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Jordon T. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?