Farr v. United States Government et al
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Defendant: United States Government, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, James Inhofe, Luke Holland, Jerry Moran, Kansas, State of, Scott Schwab, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Internal Revenue Service, Christopher Allman, Sedgwick County District Court and other known/unknown state and government actors
Case Number: 2:2022cv02476
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's four Motions for Default Judgment #31 , #32 , #33 , and #34 are denied. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on January 19, 2022. (mls)
January 17, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit B to Affidavit) (mam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 58 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #50 Defendant Scott Schwab's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit B to Affidavit) (mam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 57 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #48 Defendants State of Kansas and Sedgwick County District Court's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (mam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (mam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION TO AMEND TO JOIN ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS re #44 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N) (mam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT WHO OPPOSES A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Jerry Moran, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government re #52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Slinkard, Duston)
January 17, 2023 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Jerry Moran, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Slinkard, Duston)
January 17, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Jerry Moran, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government (Slinkard, Duston)
January 11, 2023 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Scott Schwab(Schlozman, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ( Response deadline 2/1/2023) by Defendant Scott Schwab (Schlozman, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Kansas, State of, Sedgwick County District Court(Phillips, Stephen)
January 11, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response deadline 2/1/2023) by Defendants Kansas, State of, Sedgwick County District Court (Phillips, Stephen)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #46 Plaintiff's Motion to Join Defendants. The Court deems Plaintiff's motion a motion to amend to join additional defendants. Plaintiff's motion does not attach a proposed amended pleading as required by D. Kan. R. 15.1. Plaintiff will be permitted to refile a motion to join defendants which fully complies with D. Kan. R. 15.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/10/2023. (kf)
January 9, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Titled: Motion to Join Defendants) re #44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (ca)
January 9, 2023 Filing 45 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #33 Motion for Default Judgment, #31 Motion for Default Judgment, #32 Motion for Default Judgment, #34 Motion for Default Judgment. (ca)
January 9, 2023 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Kansas, State of, Jerry Moran, Scott Schwab, Sedgwick County District Court, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government, other known/unknown state and government actors, filed by Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(ca)
January 9, 2023 Filing 43 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED by Joan E. Farr (ca)
January 9, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RECEIVED BY U.S. ATTORNEY DUSTON SLINKARD by Joan E. Farr. (ca)
January 6, 2023 Filing 41 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/10/2023 for Defendants Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Jerry Moran, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/6/2023. (jsh)
January 6, 2023 Filing 40 RESPONSE by Defendants Christopher Allman, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Jerry Moran re #33 Motion for Default Judgment, #31 Motion for Default Judgment, #32 Motion for Default Judgment, #34 Motion for Default Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Slinkard, Duston)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. Following decision on the pending motions to dismiss as well as any additional motions to be filed once Plaintiff obtains service on all Defendants, if the matter proceeds in any fashion, the Court will promptly reconvene the parties to address scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/4/2023. (mam)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER finding as moot #37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is permitted to file an Amended Complaint as a matter of right pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1). However, where Plaintiff is pro se and is not an electronic filer, the Court briefly extends the deadline for Plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint as a matter of right up to and including 1/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/3/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
January 3, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #17 Notice of Service: Plaintiff e-mailed defendant U.S. Attorney on 12/28/2022 regarding status of delivery but did not receive a response. This entry was modified to clarify the 12/28/2022 email. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #10 Defendant Schwab's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant Assistant U.S. Attorney Christopher Allman by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant Luke Holland by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant U.S. Senator Jerry Moran by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant U.S. Senator James Inhofe by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B) (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr re #9 Motion to Stay Discovery. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 29 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Department of Justice/United States Attorney General served by certified mail on 12/5/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 28 Summons Returned Executed -- Federal Bureau of Investigation/U.S. Attorney General served by certified mail on 11/29/2022. (mam) Modified on 12/30/2022 -- Originally entered as Office of the Regional Counsel, it now shows the U.S. Attorney General was served. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Kansas, State of (Kansas Attorney General) served by certified mail on 11/28/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Scott Schwab served by certified mail on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Luke Holland served by certified mail on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- James Inhofe served by certified mail on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 23 Summons Returned Executed -- United States Department of Defense/Office of the Regional Counsel served by certified mail on 11/29/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Jerry Moran served by certified mail on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Christopher Allman served by certified mail on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Sedgwick County District Court served by certified mail on 11/23/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 19 Summons Returned Executed -- Internal Revenue Service/Office of the Regional Counsel served by certified mail on 11/28/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 18 Summons Returned Executed -- Central Intelligence Agency/Office of the Regional Counsel served by certified mail on 11/28/2022. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE by Joan E. Farr upon the U.S. Attorney (obo Defendants United States Government, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency and Internal Revenue Service). (NOTE -- Plaintiff mailed the summons/complaint on 11/21/2022 by certified mail/return receipt requested. Per USPS.com, this item has been available for pickup since 11/25/2022 and remains at the post office. Plaintiff emailed defendant U.S. Attorney on 12/28/2022 regarding status of delivery but did not receive a response.) (mam) Modified on 1/3/2023 to clarify the 12/28/2022 email. (mam)
December 30, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Summons by Joan E. Farr. (mam)
December 30, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #28 : The Federal Bureau of Investigation was served through the U.S. Attorney General. (mam)
December 20, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Scott Schwab(Schlozman, Bradley)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Kansas Secretary of State Scott Schwab must file an amended Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss that conforms to Local Rule 7.1(d)(3) page limit within 10 days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/19/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
December 16, 2022 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (kf)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Scott Schwab. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 15, 2022 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Garrett Robert Roe on behalf of Scott Schwab (Roe, Garrett)
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Scott Schwab(Schlozman, Bradley)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response deadline 1/5/2023) by Defendant Scott Schwab (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Kansas, State of, Sedgwick County District Court (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Phillips, Stephen)
December 13, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kansas, State of, Sedgwick County District Court(Phillips, Stephen)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Kansas, State of, Sedgwick County District Court (Phillips, Stephen)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Joseph Schlozman on behalf of Scott Schwab. (Schlozman, Bradley)
December 8, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/06/2023 for Defendant Sedgwick County District Court to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/08/2022. (jk)
November 30, 2022 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/2/2023 for Defendant Kansas, State of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/30/2022. (jsh)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Joan E. Farr is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
November 21, 2022 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $402, receipt number 600000743. (jk)
November 21, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Allman, Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Luke Holland, James Inhofe, Internal Revenue Service, Kansas, State of, Jerry Moran, Scott Schwab, Sedgwick County District Court, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice, United States Government, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (returned to pro se Plaintiff for service). (jk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (jk)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farr v. United States Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Inhofe
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Holland
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Moran
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Schwab
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlozman
Represented By: Garrett Robert Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Duston J. Slinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick County District Court
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: other known/unknown state and government actors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?