Fellers v. Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tyler Fellers
Defendant: Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02499
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer is set for 1/31/2023 at 10:00 AM. Participants shall call 1-888-363-4749, use access code 9686294, and follow prompts to join call. The Court will be discussing with counsel a specific type of FLSA scheduling order to govern this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc..(Michel, Larry)
December 13, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Larry G. Michel on behalf of Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc. (Michel, Larry)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Fellers Tyler. (Pospisil, Michael)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5930952.), filed by Fellers Tyler.(Pospisil, Michael)
December 2, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fellers v. Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Fellers
Represented By: Michael D. Pospisil
Represented By: Matthew T. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohm Farm & Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?