Simpson v. Black & Veatch Corporation
Plaintiff: Debra Simpson
Defendant: Black & Veatch Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv02033
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Debra Simpson executed upon Black & Veatch Corporation on 02/01/2023 by Personal. (Stallworth, M.)
March 9, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Black & Veatch Corporation identifying Black & Veatch Holding Company as corporate parent. (Kim, Rachel)
March 9, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Black & Veatch Corporation.(Kim, Rachel)
March 9, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Rachel S. Kim on behalf of Black & Veatch Corporation (Kim, Rachel)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for April 4, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 3/14/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/24/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 02/24/2023. (drk)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Toby Crouse for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 2/24/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/09/2023 for Defendant Black & Veatch Corporation to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/23/2023. (jk)
January 30, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
January 30, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Black & Veatch Corporation (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Debra Simpson. (Stallworth, M.)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5971041.), filed by Debra Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stallworth, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Black & Veatch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Simpson
Represented By: M. Shaun Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Veatch Corporation
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Rachel S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?