Brown v. KU Family Med et al
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Brown
Defendant: KU Family Med, Aundria N. Eoff, Margaret L. Smith, University of Kansas Health System, The and Keith Grenir
Case Number: 2:2023cv02113
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. This case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Brown's motion to supplement, Doc. 12, is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 4/19/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ronald E. Brown by regular mail. (kas)
April 13, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Supplement by Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplement, #2 Envelope) (kmc)
March 31, 2023 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #10 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown. (ca)
March 31, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aundria N. Eoff, Keith Grenir, Margaret L. Smith, University of Kansas Health System, The, filed by Ronald E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Shawnee Mission Hospital Medical Records, #3 Olathe Health Medical Records, #4 Envelope)(ca)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re #7 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It has come to the court's attention that, due to a clerical error, the third page of plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel was inadvertently omitted when docketing the motion. After the clerk's office brought this error to the court's attention, the court reviewed the third page that the clerk's office has now docketed to determine whether the information provided has any impact on the court's #7 ORDER denying plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Having done so, the court continues to believe that its Order denying plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel is correct for all of the other reasons previously stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/22/2023. Mailed to Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown 2201 E. Cedar Street Olathe, KS 66062 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A corrected attachment has been added to #4 and to this annotation for noticing purposes only. THe original PDF attachment was missing page 3; the complete document was added to the entry (kmc)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/16/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ronald E. Brown by regular mail. (kas)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals Service shall withhold service on the defendants until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/16/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ronald E. Brown by regular mail. (kas)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to show cause, by April 14, 2023, why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 3/15/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ronald E. Brown by regular mail. (kas)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (jsh) (Original PDF attachment was missing page 3; Complete document added on 3/22/2023: #1 Corrected Motion) (kmc). Modified on 3/22/2023 (kmc).
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) (jsh)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronald E. Brown. (jsh)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Ronald E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (jsh)
March 14, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. KU Family Med et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KU Family Med
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aundria N. Eoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kansas Health System, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Grenir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?