McKinzy v. J.B. Nutter & Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. McKinzy, Sr.
Defendant: J.B. Nutter & Company, Money Source, Inc., The, United Fidelity Funding Corp., Flagstar Bank and Chicago Title Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02139
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC (Wissel, Scott)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for insufficient service of process pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) or, in the alternative, to quash service of process. For the reasons stated in the order, the motion to quash is granted. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/12/2023. Mailed to pro se party Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. by regular mail. (ca)
May 12, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Flagstar Bank (Weber, Beverly)
May 12, 2023 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flagstar Bank identifying New York Community Bancorp Inc as corporate parent . (Weber, Beverly)
May 12, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant J.B. Nutter & Company(Zarda, Christopher)
May 12, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant J.B. Nutter & Company (Zarda, Christopher)
May 11, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant United Fidelity Funding Corp. re: #13 Motion to Dismiss (Haggerty, Gary)
May 10, 2023 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT to #19 Memorandum in Opposition to #13 Motion, by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ca)
May 8, 2023 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Document titled "Plaintiff's Suggestions in Opposition to United Fidelity Funding Corp's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Insufficient Service of Process")(sz)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of T. Hunter Brown for Chicago Title Company, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/8/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
May 4, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Thomas Hunter Brown to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6052141.) by Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Wissel, Scott)
May 1, 2023 Filing 16 AMENDED CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/19/2023 for Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/1/2023. Mailed to pro se party Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
April 27, 2023 Filing 15 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/19/2023 for Defendant Flagstar Bank to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/27/2023. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. at 10568 Century Lane, Overland Park, KS 66215 by regular mail. (jk)
April 27, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 Motion to Dismis by Defendant United Fidelity Funding Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Haggerty, Gary)
April 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant United Fidelity Funding Corp. (Haggerty, Gary)
April 27, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gary C. Haggerty on behalf of United Fidelity Funding Corp. (Haggerty, Gary)
April 27, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Beverly M. Weber on behalf of Flagstar Bank. (Weber, Beverly)
April 27, 2023 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/12/2023 for Defendant J.B. Nutter & Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/27/2023. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. at 10568 Century Lane, Overland Park, KS 66215 by regular mail. (jk)
April 27, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Zarda on behalf of J.B. Nutter & Company. (Zarda, Christopher)
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/19/2023 for Defendant Chicago Title Company, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/26/2023. Mailed to pro se party Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
April 26, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Scott A. Wissel on behalf of Chicago Title Company, LLC. (Wissel, Scott)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint upon J.B. Nutter & Company, Money Source, Inc., The, Flagstar Bank, Chicago Title Company, LLC, QUASHED PER #26 ORDER United Fidelity Funding Corp., by Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. re #4 Amended Complaint. (jal) Modified on 5/15/2023 (ca).
April 12, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED re #4 Amended Complaint as to Chicago Title Company, LLC (issued and returned to plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
April 10, 2023 Filing 5 EXHIBITS 41-47 IN SUPPORT of #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (jsh)
April 7, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chicago Title Company, LLC, Flagstar Bank, J.B. Nutter & Company, Money Source, Inc., The, United Fidelity Funding Corp., filed by Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-40) (jsh)
March 29, 2023 (DISREGARD; ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE PREVIOUS DOCKET ENTRY FOR CORRECT ISSUANCE) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Flagstar Bank, J.B. Nutter & Company, Money Source, Inc., The, United Fidelity Funding Corp. (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh) Modified docket text on 3/30/2023. (jsh)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (jk)
March 28, 2023 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $402, receipt number 200000559. (jk)
March 28, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Flagstar Bank, J.B. Nutter & Company, Money Source, Inc., The, United Fidelity Funding Corp. (Returned to plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to Plaintiff for service with complaint. Copy of NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. at 10568 Century Lane, Overland Park, KS 66215 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 28, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (jk)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Michael E. McKinzy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinzy v. J.B. Nutter & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. McKinzy, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Nutter & Company
Represented By: Christopher J. Zarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Money Source, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fidelity Funding Corp.
Represented By: Gary C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank
Represented By: Beverly M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Hunter Brown
Represented By: Scott A. Wissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?