Oatis v. Armbrister et al
Plaintiff: Perry Oatis and Perry L. Oatis
Defendant: Jay Armbrister, Major Bunting, Captain Roome, Melanie Stroda, Tamara Lyles, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome and Tammi lnu
Case Number: 2:2023cv02163
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings deadline: 7/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 6/15/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Seck, Michael)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying without prejudice #28 Motion for Judgment; denying as moot #30 Motion for Order. See order for further details. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 06/14/2023. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (kmc)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #32 MOTION for extension of time. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (tl)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Order (titled: Motion for Supplemental Jurisdiction) by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (kmc)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seck, Michael)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome (Seck, Michael)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT to #21 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome. (Seck, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #25 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome(Seck, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Seck, Michael)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY (MEMORANDUM) TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis: Re: #11 Motion for Default Judgment (msb)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/30/2023. The Court held a status conference on the record. During the status conference, the Defendants indicated they will file a motion to stay by 6/2/2023. (Recorded on the FTR System from 3:00 pm - 3:20 pm) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 23 Status Conference, mailed to Perry L. Oatis on 5/30/2023 by regular mail. (cc)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Because a reply may materially aid the resolution of the motion, Oatis is ordered to reply to Defendants' response, Doc. #21 , by June 26, 2023. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/26/2023. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (jal)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #19 : This entry has been updated to include the ruling of the Armbrister defendants' motion for extension of time to file an answer. An updated docket sheet along with this notice mailed to plaintiff Perry L. Oatis as the Douglas County Correctional Facility by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Oatis's motions for default judgment are denied (Docs. #11 and #12 ). The Armbrister defendants have shown good cause for delay in filing their answer, and so their motion to file an answer, (Doc. 9), is granted. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/24/23. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail (msb) Modified on 5/25/2023 to include the ruling on Doc. 9. (mam)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Reply deadline 5/24/2023 as to #11 MOTION for Default Judgment. (msb)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Screening. The Plaintiff is not in forma pauperis status in this Court and Plaintiff has not requested such status. Therefore, no screening is required under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/10/2023. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference is continued to 5/30/2023 at 3:00 PM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. The Court continues the status conference to review materials already in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/10/2023. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Default Judgment by Defendants Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Melanie Stroda, Tammi lnu. (Hicks, John) Modified text and added link on 5/11/2023 (msb).
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 17 Order Setting Status Conference,, mailed to Perry L. Oatis on 5/10/2023 by regular mail. (cc)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 18 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, mailed to Perry L. Oatis on 5/10/2023 by regular mail. (cc)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome re #12 Motion for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seck, Michael)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome. (Seck, Michael)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Screening by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seck, Michael)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment against Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome, by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk (also filed in #10 and #11 ), #2 Envelope)(ca)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Advanced Correctional Healthcare and personnel, by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, (also filed in #10 and #12 ) #2 Envelope)(ca)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND RESPONSE to defendant's pleading by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(ca)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome re 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Seck, Michael) Modified on 5/25/2023, wrong event type used. (mam)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Melanie Stroda, Tammi lnu identifying none as corporate parent. (Hicks, John)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Melanie Stroda, Tammi lnu. (Hicks, John)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/24/2023. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 5 Order Setting Status Conference, mailed to Perry L. Oatis on 4/24/2023 by regular mail. (cc)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 04/19/23. Mailed to pro se party Perry L. Oatis by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis #17578 at Douglas County Correctional Facility 3601 E. 25th St., Lawrence, KS 66046 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome re #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Originally filed in the Douglas County District Court on 4/11/2023.) (mam)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Perry L. Oatis. (Originally filed in the Douglas County District Court on 2/21/2023.) (mam)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Jay Armbrister, fnu Bunting, fnu Roome. (FILED IN DOUGLAS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 4/11/2023; See Doc #2 for pleading). (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (kas)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Tamara lnu, Melanie Stroda. (Hicks, John)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Douglas County. (Hicks, John)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Douglas County, case number 2023-CV-000013, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6038432.), filed by Tamara lnu, Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Melanie Stroda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hicks, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oatis v. Armbrister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Oatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry L. Oatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Armbrister
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Roome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Stroda
Represented By: John Russell Hicks
Represented By: Emily Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Lyles
Represented By: John Russell Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare
Represented By: John Russell Hicks
Represented By: Emily Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fnu Bunting
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fnu Roome
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi lnu
Represented By: John Russell Hicks
Represented By: Emily Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?