Miller v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: James G Miller and James G. Miller
Defendant: Paul C. Miller, Kathleen M Miller, Kathleen M. Miller, as trustee KMM Family Trust, dated February 7, 2017, Kathleen M. Miller and K.M.M. Family Trust
Case Number: 2:2023cv02343
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Counterclaims. Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 10/02/2023, in which to file an amended answer that contains any counterclaims. Given the recent filing of the case and the answer, the current posture of the case, and the short extension requested by Defendants, the Court finds Plaintiff will not be unduly prejudiced by the short extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/25/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 9/21/2023. (ca)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff James G. Miller re #13 MOTION for extension of time to file counterclaims "Plaintiff James G. Miller's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for a Extension of Time to File Counterclaims" (Klucas, Kyle)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Toby Crouse: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/12/2023. The Court GRANTS Doc. #10 , Motion for Hearing and sets Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 10/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Toby Crouse.(Court Reporter Sherry Harris.) (ta)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file counterclaims by Defendants K.M.M. Family Trust, Paul C. Miller, Kathleen M. Miller (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Manito, Audrey)
September 11, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by K.M.M. Family Trust, Paul C. Miller, Kathleen M. Miller.(Manito, Audrey)
September 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 03:00 PM by Telephone TC - CONFERENCE LINE 1-877-402-9753 ACCESS CODE 6722344 before District Judge Toby Crouse. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Plaintiff's Hearing Regarding Motion for TRO and Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff James G. Miller. (Klucas, Kyle)
September 8, 2023 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing Regarding Plaintiff's #7 Motion for TRO and Injunctive Relief. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
August 25, 2023 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/11/2023 for Defendants K.M.M. Family Trust, Paul C. Miller, Kathleen M. Miller to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/25/2023. (nac) Modified on 8/25/2023 to add date to text (nac).
August 23, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by James G. Miller re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief. (Klucas, Kyle)
August 22, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff James G. Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Checking Account Statements)(Fairlie, Zachary)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by James G. Miller upon K.M.M. Family Trust served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023 (Fairlie, Zachary)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by James G. Miller upon Kathleen M. Miller served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023 (Fairlie, Zachary)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by James G. Miller upon Paul C. Miller served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023 (Fairlie, Zachary)
August 7, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to K.M.M. Family Trust, Paul C. Miller, Kathleen M. Miller. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nao)
August 7, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nao)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James G. Miller - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Fairlie, Zachary)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff James G. Miller. (Fairlie, Zachary)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6122298.), filed by James G. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Judgment and Order)(Fairlie, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Miller
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Gustav Fairlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Klucas
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Gustav Fairlie
Represented By: Emily Nicole Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul C. Miller
Represented By: Audrey Manito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Miller, as trustee KMM Family Trust, dated February 7, 2017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Miller
Represented By: Audrey Manito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.M.M. Family Trust
Represented By: Audrey Manito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?