Richardson v. Wesley Medical Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Rhonda Richardson
Defendant: Wesley Medical Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02398
Filed: September 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Wesley Medical Center, LLC of Wesley Medical Center's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Watson, Michelle)
October 19, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wesley Medical Center, LLC identifying HCA Healthcare, Inc. as corporate parent . (Watson, Michelle)
October 19, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Wesley Medical Center, LLC.(Watson, Michelle)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint via USPS by Rhonda Richardson (Steele, Jonathan)
October 12, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Rhonda Richardson upon Wesley Medical Center, LLC served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Delivery)(Steele, Jonathan)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for November 8, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/18/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/27/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/11/2023. (drk)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding #6 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and #7 Response to the Show-Cause Order. The Magistrate Judge previously ordered plaintiffs to #4 show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the complaint did not adequately allege complete diversity of citizenship. Plaintiffs' response to the show-cause order and amended complaint address the concerns raised in the Court's show-cause order. Accordingly, the Magistrate Judge will not recommend dismissal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/10/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bh)
October 10, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle M. Watson on behalf of Wesley Medical Center, LLC. (Watson, Michelle)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Justen P. Phelps on behalf of Wesley Medical Center, LLC. (Phelps, Justen)
October 6, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Rhonda Richardson(Steele, Jonathan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wesley Medical Center, LLC, filed by Rhonda Richardson. NOTE: this is a refiling of DE #5 for administrative purposes. (ca)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 (DISREGARD ENTRY - INCORRECT PARTY SELECTION AT TIME OF FILING - SEE DE # 6 FOR CORRECT FILING) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Rhonda Richardson. (Steele, Jonathan) Modified on 9/26/2023 (kao).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiffs to show cause in writing to the Magistrate Judge by 10/6/2023, why the Magistrate Judge should not recommend that the District Judge dismiss this case without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' response to the show-cause order must point to factual allegations that, if true, would establish complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/18/2023. (mam)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Richardson - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
September 11, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wesley Medical Center, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 11, 2023 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 11, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
September 9, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rhonda Richardson. (Steele, Jonathan)
September 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6148855.), filed by Rhonda Richardson. (Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Wesley Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Richardson
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Justen P. Phelps
Represented By: Michelle M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?