Rhone v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosalind Rhone
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02416
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Alig, Susan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Walmart, Inc.(Windham, Lindsay)
November 10, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (Windham, Lindsay)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendant Walmart, Inc. of taking deposition of Plaintiff on February 13, 2024 (Windham, Lindsay)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Walmart, Inc.. (Windham, Lindsay)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Rosalind Rhone upon Walmart, Inc. served on 9/29/2023, answer due 11/20/2023 (DuPree, Antonette)
November 1, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and RFPs to Defendant by Rosalind Rhone. (DuPree, Antonette)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/8/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/17/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 11/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/17/2023. (ht)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond by November 20, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/10/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Alig, Susan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Poehling Windham on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Windham, Lindsay)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Susan Alig on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Alig, Susan)
September 20, 2023 Alias Summons Issued as to Walmart, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rosalind Rhone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Designation of Place of Trial)(DuPree, Antonette)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6154723.), filed by Rosalind Rhone.(DuPree, Antonette)
September 15, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walmart, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
September 15, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhone v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Rhone
Represented By: Antonette M. DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Poehling Windham
Represented By: Susan Alig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?