Mendy v. Bell Bank Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Alphonse Mendy
Defendant: Bell Bank Mortgage and Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02539
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC re: #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Doering, Michael)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Alphonse Mendy re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (sz)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/16/2024. (sz)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC (Doering, Michael)
December 16, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Alphonse Mendy upon Bell Bank Mortgage served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (jk)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Alphonse Mendy upon Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (nac)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Alphonse Mendy is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Alphonse Mendy. (jsh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Alphonse Mendy. (jsh)
December 5, 2023 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 200001158. (jsh)
December 5, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
December 5, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC, Bell Bank Mortgage (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to plaintiff for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendy v. Bell Bank Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonse Mendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Bank Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Nationwide Title Agency, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Doering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?