Haarslev, Inc. v. Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Haarslev, Inc.
Defendant: Tom's Metal Enterprises doing business as Industrial Metal Enterprises, LLC, Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC doing business as Industrial Metal Enterprises, LLC also known as IME and IME
Case Number: 2:2023cv02569
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
3 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery Scheduling Conference, Rule 26(f) Planning Conference and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. The Court grants the motion as unopposed and for good cause. The Court vacates the current March 19, 2024 scheduling conference setting and all other deadlines set out in the #15 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. Discovery is stayed pending a ruling on #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. If any live dispute remains after the Court's ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, within seven calendar days of that ruling, the parties are directed to submit a proposed scheduling order and the parties' initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures consistent with the process outlined in the #15 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. The Court thereafter will reschedule the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 2/15/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery re #15 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling, and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Defendant Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Wolf, Ann)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for March 19, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/19/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/26/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 2/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 02/05/2024. (drk)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC re: #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Ann)
February 1, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Broomes, Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/1/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
January 24, 2024 Filing 12 (DUPLICATE filing to #11 ) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haarslev, Inc. identifying Haarslev Industries A/S as corporate parent (Leiker, Jason) Modified on 1/24/2024. (kmc)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haarslev, Inc. identifying Haarslev Industries A/S as corporate parent. (Leiker, Jason)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Haarslev, Inc. re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Affidavit of Troels Svendsen (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leiker, Jason)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob M. Doleshal on behalf of Haarslev, Inc. (Doleshal, Jacob)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haarslev, Inc. identifying Haarslev Industries A/S as corporate parent (Leiker, Jason)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason S. Leiker on behalf of Haarslev, Inc. (Leiker, Jason)
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chad Mitchell, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Rick David)(Wolf, Ann)
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Tom's Metal Enterprises - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wolf, Ann)
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Notice of Removal by Tom's Metal Enterprises re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolf, Ann)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Petition (Doc. 1), #2 State Court Records Request and Service Instruction Form)(Wolf, Ann)
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC. (Wolf, Ann)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court Johnson County, Kansas, case number 23CV06257 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6235063.), filed by Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wolf, Ann)
December 26, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haarslev, Inc. v. Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haarslev, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob M. Doleshal
Represented By: Jason S. Leiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom's Metal Enterprises doing business as Industrial Metal Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Ann V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom's Metal Enterprises, LLC doing business as Industrial Metal Enterprises, LLC also known as IME
Represented By: Ann V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IME
Represented By: Ann V. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?