Lehman-Kemp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Tayana Lehman-Kemp
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2024cv02586
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. Initial Brief due by 3/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 001 Certification Page, #2 002 Court Transcript Index, #3 003 Administrative documents and oral hearing transcript (Pages 1 - 446), #4 004 Payment documents and decisions (Pages 447 - 470), #5 005 Jurisdictional documents and notices (Pages 471 - 547), #6 006 Non disability related development (Pages 548 - 572), #7 007 Disability related development (Pages 573 - 662), #8 008 Medical Records (Pages 663 - 1195), #9 009 Medical Records (Pages 1196 - 1712))(Sobota, Margaret)
January 23, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On 1/21/2025, Michelle King replaced Carolyn W. Colvin as the Acting Commissioner of Social Security. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of has been updated to reflect this change. (mam)
December 19, 2024 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Sobota on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Sobota, Margaret)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the clerk has notified the US Attorney and the SSA Office of General Counsel of this action electronically; no summonses will be issued. Social Security Administrative Record due 2/18/2025. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/19/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Tayana Lehman-Kemp (Sciolaro, Kyle)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tayana Lehman-Kemp. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - SOCIAL SECURITY with trial location of Kansas City. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the Notice of Electronic Filing for this Complaint has been transmitted to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas, as well as the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel, filed by Tayana Lehman-Kemp.(Sciolaro, Kyle)
December 19, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman-Kemp v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Margaret Sobota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayana Lehman-Kemp
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Represented By: Andrea McGrath Wehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?