Buller v. Segway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Natalia Buller
Defendant: Segway, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2025cv02015
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 3 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 5/12/2025. Mediation deadline 5/25/2025. Discovery deadline 7/25/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2025 at 01:30 PM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 913-423-1010 ACCESS CODE 172 480 243 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 9/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 03/13/2025. (kmc)
March 13, 2025 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 3/13/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 27, 2025 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 2/27/2025. As discussed in further detail on the record, the parties must submit a revised proposed scheduling order by March 6, 2025, via email sent to ksd_mitchell_chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov. The court will reconvene the scheduling conference on March 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Parties are directed to call in to CONFERENCE LINE 1-913-423-1010 and enter CONFERENCE ID 172 480 243. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 18, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Segway, Inc. of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Gunter, Vincent)
February 18, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Natalia Buller of Initial Disclosures (Madden, Brian)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Participants must dial in to the conference call at 913-423-1010, then enter conference ID 172 480 243# and follow the prompts to join the call as a participant. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 2/7/2025. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/18/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 2/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/17/2025. (ca)
January 17, 2025 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Segway, Inc. of #1 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Segway, Inc. identifying Ninebot Limited as corporate parent. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Segway, Inc. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Edward Gunter on behalf of Segway, Inc. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Segway, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Segway, Inc. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas Case JO-2024-CV-005975. (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number JO-2024-CV-005975, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6561014.), filed by Segway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition) (Gunter, Vincent)
January 14, 2025 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buller v. Segway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segway, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Edward Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Buller
Represented By: Zachery Galyon
Represented By: Brian J. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?