Burks v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Burks
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2025cv02032
Filed: January 22, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. Initial Brief due by 4/21/2025. (Thomas, Michael)
January 30, 2025 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Arlen Thomas on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Thomas, Michael)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thaddeus Burks. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
January 22, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - SOCIAL SECURITY with trial location of Kansas City. ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6566743.) Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the Notice of Electronic Filing for this Complaint has been transmitted to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas, as well as the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel, filed by Thaddeus Burks. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
January 22, 2025 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Social Security Administrative Record due 3/24/2025. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burks v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Burks
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Represented By: Andrea McGrath Wehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Michael Arlen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?