Evans v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Donna Marie Evans
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2025cv02035
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. Initial Brief due by 4/14/2025. (Johnson, Victoria)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #3 ) of attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Donna Marie Evans under D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/24/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Victoria Vina Johnson on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Johnson, Victoria)
January 24, 2025 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all proceedings. Social Security Administrative Record due 3/25/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6569476.) by Plaintiff Donna Marie Evans. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Whipple, David)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Donna Marie Evans. (Whipple, David)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - SOCIAL SECURITY with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6569446.), filed by Donna Marie Evans Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Fed. R. Civ. P. Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, the Notice of Electronic Filing for this Complaint has been transmitted to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas, as well as the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel. (Whipple, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Marie Evans
Represented By: David W. Whipple
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Victoria Vina Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?