Hood v. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ian Hood
Defendant: Craig Murphy, (fnu) Whitaker, T Hall, Steven Lovett and Tammy Harper
Case Number: 5:2008cv03112
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 20 plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; and granting 29 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 6/26/09. (mss)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ENTERED: All defendants and all claims are dismissed from this action, except plaintiff's claim against defendant Sgt. T. Hall for excessive force on February 27, 2008. Plaintiff's motion 11 to contest is denied. Plaintiff's imbedded request 11 for counsel and motion 12 to appoint counsel are denied, and his motion 15 for discovery of documents is denied, all without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall prepare summons and waiver of service forms pursuant to Ru le 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to be served on defendant Hall. The screening process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A having been completed, this matter is returned to the clerk of the court for random reassignment pursuant to D.Kan.R. 40.1. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/16/08. (smnd)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 2 for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. Plaintiff's motion 3 to appoint counsel is denied. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days in which to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/10/08. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ian Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?