Dodson Aviation, Inc. v. HLMP Aviation Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dodson Aviation, Inc.
Defendant: HLMP Aviation Corporation, PTC Aviation Corporation and 1st Source Bank
Case Number: 5:2008cv04102
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Order. See text of order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 12/16/2011. (ch)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/31/2011. (ch)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Quash. Considering plaintiffs numerous technical deficiencies, the court finds that the motion should be denied. See text of order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 6/1/09. (wl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson Aviation, Inc. v. HLMP Aviation Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dodson Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Laura L. McConwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HLMP Aviation Corporation
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTC Aviation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Source Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?