Ward v. Gray
Petitioner: Brian Scott Ward
Respondent: James W. Gray
Case Number: 5:2010cv03047
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion 39 to dismiss this matter as moot is granted. The motion 41 of Charles W. Gittins is denied as moot. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 9/27/2012. (smnd)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion 34 to strike is denied. Respondent's motion 37 for an extension of time to file an answer is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion 40 for an extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss is granted. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 2/28/2012. (smnd)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 9 for leave to hold this matter in abeyance is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion 15 to amend and supplement and motion 15 for appointment of counsel are granted. Melody Evans is ap pointed to represent the petitioner and is granted 45 days to review the record and, if necessary, to amend the petition. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 3/4/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Brian Scott Ward by regular mail.) (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Scott Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James W. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?