Lamm v. Grubbs et al
Plaintiff: Jeramie Lamm
Defendant: John Speer, John Doe (1), John Doe (2), John Doe (3), Andrew Garcia, Kyle Conord, Adam Hoover, Terry Avery, Yvonne Sieg and Michael J. Grubbs
Case Number: 5:2011cv03019
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.Plaintiffs Complaint as to Defendant John Speer shall be DISMISSED without prejudice, for lack of prosecution. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/24/2012.Mailed to pro se party Jeramie Lamm, #80893, El Dorado Correctional Facility, PO Box 311, El Dorado, KS 67042 by regular mail.(pp)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 25 for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice and his request 30 for an order regarding the Martinez Report is denied. The clerk shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of th e Federal Rules of Procedure. The screening process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A having been completed, this matter is returned to the clerk of the court for random reassignment pursuant to D. Kan. R. 401. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/12/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Jeramie Lamm by regular mail.) (smnd)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 2 for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Procedure and summons to be served by a United States Marshal or a Deputy Marshal at no cost to plaintiff. The clerk of the court shall enter the Kansas Department of Corrections as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 6/15/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Jeramie Lamm by regular mail.) (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamm v. Grubbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Conord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Grubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramie Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?