Washington v. Roberts et al
Petitioner: Marcus B. Washington
Respondent: Raymond Roberts and Derek Schmidt
Case Number: 5:2011cv03045
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The petition for habeas corpus is dismissed and all relief is denied. Petitioner's motion 43 for order to file a supplemental brief and his motion 52 to supplement the record with a typewritten copy of that br ief are granted. Petitioner's combined renewed motion 46 to appoint and to submit certified question is denied. Respondents' motion 49 to strike petitioner's motion for summary judgment is granted and the motion 48 for summary judgment is denied. Petitioner's motion 51 for evidentiary hearing is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/30/15. Mailed to pro se party Marcus Washington by regular mail. (smnd)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 13 for reconsideration is denied. Petitioner's motion 25 for an extension of time is granted. The time for filing a traverse is extended to and including January 22, 2012. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/22/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Marcus B. Washington by regular mail.) (smnd)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 4 for an evidentiary hearing is denied. Respondent's motion 11 for an extension of time to and including September 5, 2011, is granted. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 8/4/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Marcus B. Washington by regular mail.) (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus B. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Roberts
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derek Schmidt
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?