McCormick v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Dale E. McCormick
Defendant: Brett Peterson, David McKune, Ray Roberts and Roger Werholtz
Case Number: 5:2011cv03130
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Monti L. Belot
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 90 Motion for Order. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 3/7/2013. Plaintiff's motion is denied. No motion for reconsideration, however styled, will be entertained. Plaintiff is ordered to file a respons e to defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before March 27, 2013. (Doc. 83 ). No request for additional time will be considered. The failure to fully comply with Rule 56, this court's Rule 56.1 and applicable case authority will result in the court striking plaintiff's response and considering defendants' motion as uncontested. Mailed to pro se party Dale E. McCormick by regular mail. (aa)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 98 Motion for Reconsideration re 91 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/16/2012. Mailed to pro se party Dale E. McCormick by regular mail. (est)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 34 Motion for Order; denying 35 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 36 Motion for Order; denying 16 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 4/26/2012. (aa) Modified on 4/26/2012 to reflect that the Plaintiff was notified by NEF, not mailed a copy of the order (aa).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss Count VIII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 2/24/2012. (alm)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 2 to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. Plaintiff is given thirty (30) days in which to submit to the court an initial partial filing fee of $17.50. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. Plaintiff is assessed the full filing fee of $350.00, and after he has paid the initial fee, the remainder is to be paid by payments automatically deducted from his inmate trust fund account. Plaintiff� 39;s motion 3 to forego form is granted. Plaintiff's motion 5 for preliminary injunction is denied without prejudice. This action is dismissed as against Governor Sam Brownback and defendant State of Kansas for lack of personal participati on. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Procedure. The clerk of the court shall enter the Kansas Department of Corrections as an interested party on the docket for the limited p urpose of preparing the Martinez report. The screening process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A having been completed, this matter is returned to the clerk of the court for random reassignment. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 8/25/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Dale McCormick by regular mail.) (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McKune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale E. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?