Creamer v. Gildemeister et al
Plaintiff: Marjorie A. Creamer
Defendant: S. Gildemeister and Glenn Braun
Case Number: 5:2015cv04871
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Ellis
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 169 Motion On Basis For Relief for Summary Judgment and For Settlement. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/17/19. (hw)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER striking 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/9/18. (hw)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 97 Motion for Order.Pursuant to Rule 54(b),Fed. R. Civ. Pro., the Court directs the clerk to enter final judgment in favor of judge Braun. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Gildemeister remain pending. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/25/2017. (ydm)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 66 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court directs Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James to appoint counsel to represent plaintiff's interests in this matter, and expedite allappropriate pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/28/2017. (ydm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creamer v. Gildemeister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie A. Creamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gildemeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?