McCoy (ID 76894) v. Aramark Correctional Services et al
Plaintiff: DeRon McCoy, Jr.
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, Julie Dockendorff, Patricia Berry, Cheryl Allen, M. Gilly and Paul Church
Case Number: 5:2016cv03027
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 176 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. The case is closed. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/2/2020. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (jal)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 144 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 147 defendants' Motion to Strike or for leave to respond and 153 defendants' Motion to Strike or leave to respond; denying as moot 156 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. See Order for deadlines. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/23/2019. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 148 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/7/19. Mailed to pro se party Deron McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (df)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 122 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/18. (hw)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendant Allen's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Motion to Stay Deadlines, and Motion to Stay Discovery 103 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. The motion is granted in all other respects. Defendant Allen must respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by August 31, 2018. No further extensions will be granted on this response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Berry's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 99 is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 09/27/2018. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 09/19/2018. Mailed to pro se party Deron McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 103 defendant Allen's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Motion to Stay Deadlines and Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 99 defendant Berry's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 08/17/2018. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff shall show good cause in writing by June 15, 2018, why defendants Berry and Allen's motions for judgment on the pleadings should not be granted as unopposed, including any response plaintiff wishes the court to consider in this matter. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/30/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (kao)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants Aramark Correctional Services, Paul Church, Julie Dockendorff, and Rabbi M. Fellig's Motion to Dismiss 57 is granted as to Rabbi M. Fellig. It is granted on any individual capacity RLUIPA claims. It is denied in all other respects. Defendant Patricia Berry's Motion to Dismiss 59 is granted regarding defendant's § 1983 claim against her in her official capacity and for any retroactive relief. It is denied regarding any individua l capacity claim against her for money damages or prospective relief under § 1983. It is granted regarding plaintiff's RLUIPA claims. Defendant Cheryl Allen's Motion to Dismiss 70 is denied regarding any individual capacity RLUIPA c laim and denied in all other respects. Defendant Allen's Motion for Extension of Time 76 is granted. Defendant Allen shall respond to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment within three weeks of this order's entry. Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Class Certification is denied and Motion to Appoint Counsel 80 is denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 03/16/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/29/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (kao)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 48 is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted in all respects except that the Kansas Department of Corrections is immune from suit and cannot be added as a defendant. Plaint iff's claim for injunctive relief is construed as one against Defendant Berry in her official capacity. The Clerk's Office is directed to redact paragraph 11 from page 4 of Doc. 48-3 and file it as Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 06/14/17.Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy (ID 76894) v. Aramark Correctional Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeRon McCoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services
Represented By: Sherri L. Price
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Dockendorff
Represented By: Sherri L. Price
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Berry
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gilly
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Church
Represented By: Catherine A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?