Sperry (ID 47031) v. Wildermuth et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Sperry
Defendant: Lindsey Wildermuth, Andrew Lucht, Christopher Ross, Kevin Bosch, (fnu) Hunt, Collette Winklebauer, Rex Pryor, K. Lee, Larry Hoshaw, Daniel Jackson, Phillip Patterson, Robert Sapien, Hannah Booth, James Heimgartner, Johnnie Goddard, Douglas Burris, Bill Shipman, Raymond Roberts, Corizon Health, Inc., Rebecca (lnu), (fnu) Brundage, Union Supply Group, Inc., Jack Cauble and Don Raymond
Case Number: 5:2016cv03222
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 52 ) is granted. This matter is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/30/20. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Defendants are granted to and including June 19, 2020, to show good cause why they should not be ordered to respond to the complaint within twenty-one (21) days and to comply with standard pretrial procedures under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/12/20. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of Court shall serve Defendants under the e-service pilot program in effect with the Kansas Department of Corrections ("KDOC"). Upon the electronic filing of the Waiver of Service Executed pursuant to the e-service program, KDOC shall have sixty (60) days to prepare the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, the AG/Defendants shall have an additional sixty (60) days to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall enter KDOC as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, KDOC may move for termination from this action. The Clerk of the Court shall correct the docket sheet t o reflect the Court's memorandum and order of May 9, 2018 28 by removing Corizon Health, Inc.; Rebecca LNU; FNU Brundage; Union Supply Group, Inc.; Jack Cauble; and Don Raymond as defendants in this matter. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/08/19. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including November 16, 2018, in which to show good cause, in writing, why Counts II, III, VIII, X, XI, and the RICO claim in Count VII of his complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/16/18.Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 27 is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall sever each of Counts IV, IX, XIII, and IV of Plaintiff's amended complaint 25 into a separate case and assess a filing fee for each. Plaintiff's request for certification of issues for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/09/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted until February 28, 2018, to show good cause why Defendants Corizon Health, Inc., Rebecca (LNU), (FNU) Brundage, Union Supply Group, Inc., Jack Cauble, and Don Raymond and Counts IV, IX, XII, and IV should not be dismissed from this action or, in the alternative, Counts IV, IX, XII, and IV should not be severed into separate lawsuits. Within the same period, Plaintiff may file a complete and proper second amended complaint to cure the misjoinder. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/30/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 06/13/17. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey J. Sperry by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sperry (ID 47031) v. Wildermuth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Sperry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Wildermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lucht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collette Winklebauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hoshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sapien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heimgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Supply Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Cauble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?