Panel Specialists, Inc. v. Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Plaintiff: Panel Systems Plus, Inc.
Defendant: Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Counter_claimant: Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Counter_defendant: Panel Systems Plus, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04140
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 147 Motion to Exclude Expert Witness Thomas Aston Jr. and denying Plaintiff's 148 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Edward Whitfield. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/7/2019. (md)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 2/13/19. (msb)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in consistency with the order 130 Motion to Strike; granting 106 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting 108 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Memorandum & Order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/28/18. (msb)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Submit Expert Report on Markup Out of Time. Plaintiff Panel Specialists, Inc. is allowed twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to conduct another deposition of Ed Whitfield related to his expert opinion. Plaintiff Panel Specialists, Inc. is allowed thirty (30) days from the date of this order to designate a rebuttal expert witness on the issue of markups. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/16/2018. (wh)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 49 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 8/16/2017. (wh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panel Specialists, Inc. v. Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panel Systems Plus, Inc.
Represented By: L. Etienne Balart
Represented By: Christopher D. Cazenave
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Represented By: Matthew A. Spahn
Represented By: Zachery K. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Represented By: David E. Bengtson
Represented By: Patrick A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Tenawa Haven Processing, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Panel Systems Plus, Inc.
Represented By: L. Etienne Balart
Represented By: Christopher D. Cazenave
Represented By: Michael G. Jones
Represented By: Matthew A. Spahn
Represented By: Zachery K. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?