Collins (ID 79661) v. Bebb et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lee Collins
Defendant: Alex Bebb, Samuel Floyd, Howard Y. Chang, Roya Attari, Shannen M. Larsen, Joel Anderson, Mathew S. Sinnwell, Michelle R. Tunnell, Haley D. Brennanmen, Addison Pfannenstiel, Chad Day and Kim M. Reed
Case Number: 5:2017cv03050
Filed: March 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 194 Motion in Limine; granting 227 Motion to Dismiss. Case is closed. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/10/2019.Mailed to pro se party Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (ydm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ENTERED: The clerk's office is directed to correct the docket entry for Plaintiff Jeremy Lee Collins' filing titled "Judicial Notice" (ECF No. 192 ) to reflect that it is a "Motion to Take Judicial Notice." The "Motion to Take Judicial Notice" (ECF No. 192 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/14/19. Mailed to pro se party Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (smnd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 160 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/2019. (ydm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 70 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 10/29/2018. Mailed to pro se party plaintiff Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (wh)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 52 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nelson Mosley. Defendant Nelson Mosley is dismissed from this action. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/11/2018. Mailed to pro se party Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (ydm)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER striking 59 Motion for Order; striking 60 Motion for Leave to File; striking 61 Motion for Ruling; striking 63 Motion to Dismiss; striking 64 Motion for Order; striking 65 Motion for Leave to File; striking 66 Motion for Leave to File; granting 68 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 8/15/2018. Mailed to pro se party plaintiff Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (wh)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Modify; granting 41 Motion to Stay Case. This action is stayed from April 3, 2018 until May 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/17/2018. Mailed to pro se party plaintiff Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (wh)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 26 is granted. The Clerk is directed to docket Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint at Doc. 26-1. Counsel for Defendants shall submit under seal the current or last known address information f or Defendant Bebb to the clerk of court by March 16, 2018. The clerk of court shall prepare a waiver of service form pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d), to be served upon Defendant Nelson Mosley at no cost to Plaintiff. Plaintiff's motions regar ding service 27 & 36 are denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 28 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 37 is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/06/18. Mailed to pro se party Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail. (smnd)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 10 & 12 Motions for Reconsideration; granting 15 Motion to Withdraw 14 Motion to Stay Case; denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/15/17. Mailed to pro se party Jeremy Lee Collins by regular mail (msb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins (ID 79661) v. Bebb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lee Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Bebb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Y. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roya Attari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannen M. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew S. Sinnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle R. Tunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley D. Brennanmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Pfannenstiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?