Jones v. Wichita Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Jones
Defendant: Wichita Detention Center, Jeff Easter and (fnu) Melendez
Case Number: 5:2017cv03089
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Court finds in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. Judgment should be entered in favor of Defendants Paredes and Guitierrez. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/15/2021. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones at the Hutchinson CF by regular mail. (mam)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Clarification of Order and Memorandum (Doc. 124 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/7/2020. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones at the Sedgwick County Jail by regular mail. (mam)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 92 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Sheriff Jeff Easter is granted summary judgment on all claims against him, but claims against Defendants Paredes and Gui tierrez remain. Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge Gale's Recommendation (Doc. 99 ) is OVERRULED IN PART and SUSTAINED IN PART. It is upheld with regard to Defendant Easter, but it is not upheld as to Defendants Paredes and Guitie rrez. The Court thus adopts the Report and Recommendation for Sanctions (Docs. 85 ) but only as to Defendant Easter. The remaining portion of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 60 ) not previously ruled upon is found moot. Plaintiff's "Motion to Determine Certification Violations, Spoliation of Evidence, and Renewed Request for Sanctions" (Doc. 114 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Conference (Doc. 117 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 05/15/20. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 95 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by certified mail. (df)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Compel; taking under advisement 60 Motion for Sanctions; denying 62 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/11/19. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (df)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Responses to Admissions. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion to Compel is extended to 4/1/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/11/19.Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (aw)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/27/18. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (df)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Wichita Detention Center are dismissed. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 3 is denied without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of ser vice forms pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d), to be served upon Defendants at no cost to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court shall enter the County Commissioners of Sedgwick County, Kansas, as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose o f preparing the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, the Commissioners may move for termination from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/20/17. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wichita Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?