Heath (ID 63392) v. Norwood et al
Petitioner: Glenn A. Heath
Respondent: Joe Norwood, Kansas Prison Review Board and Attorney General of Kansas
Case Number: 5:2017cv03114
Filed: July 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Mr. Heath's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis 29 is denied. The Clerk shall notify the parties and the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals of its decision to deny Mr. Heath's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/29/18. Mailed to pro se party Glenn A. Heath by regular mail. (smnd)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied. Petitioner's Motion for Hearing 20 is denied. Petitioner's Motion to Produce 21 is denied. The certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/05/18. Mailed to pro se party Glenn A. Heath by regular mail. (smnd)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Respondents' motion 5 is granted and the time for filing a response is extended to and including October 23, 2017. The time for filing a traverse is extended to and including November 24, 2017. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/22/17. Mailed to pro se party Glenn A. Heath by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath (ID 63392) v. Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn A. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas Prison Review Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?