Newson v. Quintanar et al

Plaintiff: Devoris Antoine Newson
Defendant: David Quintanar, Jonathan Norton and Tabatha Neubert
Case Number: 5:2017cv03210
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Geary
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/09/18. Mailed to pro se party Devoris Antoine Newson by regular mail. (smnd)
September 5, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is directed to show cause to Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow, in writing, on or before October 5, 2018, why this matter should not be dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/05/18. Mailed to pro se party Devoris Antoine Newson. (smnd)
May 7, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Speedy Trial 9 is denied. Plaintiff is granted until June 1, 2018, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/07/18. Mailed to pro se party Devoris Antoine Newson by regular mail. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newson v. Quintanar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devoris Antoine Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Quintanar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabatha Neubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?