Barnett (ID 86695) v. Schnurr et al
Plaintiff: Paul Lawrence Barnett
Defendant: Leo C. Duran and Dan Schnurr
Case Number: 5:2018cv03220
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff to show good cause in writing to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States Senior District Judge, why Plaintiff's complaint should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2018. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/5/18. Mailed to pro se party Paul Lawrence Barnett by regular mail (msb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Paul Lawrence Barnett, #86695: now at El Dorado Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 311, El Dorado, Kansas 67042 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Paul Lawrence Barnett (smnd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Lawrence Barnett (Attachments: #1 Inmate Bank Statement) (smnd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Paul Lawrence Barnett (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
August 21, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Notice was sent to Plaintiff Paul Lawrence Barnett reminding him that he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett (ID 86695) v. Schnurr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo C. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lawrence Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?