Evans v. Horton

Petitioner: Mark Evans
Respondent: Dawn Evans and Caroline Horton
Case Number: 5:2018cv03240
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Per Chambers, Respondent Colonel Caroline Horton has been substituted for Respondent Dawn Evans. (ht)
October 18, 2018 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dawn Evans. (Attachments: #1 Attach. 1, #2 Attach. 2, #3 Attach. 3, #4 Attach. 4, #5 Attach. 5, #6 Attach. 6, #7 Attach. 7, #8 Attach. 8, #9 Attach. 9, #10 Attach. 10, #11 Attach. 11)(Morehead, Terra)
October 2, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Allan Feldmeier for Mark Evans pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/02/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 28, 2018 4 MOTION for attorney Robert Feldmeier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4595131.) by Petitioner Mark Evans (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Angotti, Angela)
September 17, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause on or before October 18, 2018, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner has until November 19, 2018, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/17/18. Mailed to pro se party Mark M. Evans by regular mail; e-mailed to U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd)
September 14, 2018 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631012141 (smnd)
September 14, 2018 2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Mark Evans (smnd)
September 14, 2018 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Mark Evans (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dawn Evans
Represented By: Terra D. Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Caroline Horton
Represented By: Terra D. Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Evans
Represented By: Angela L. Angotti
Represented By: Robert Allan Feldmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?