Howard v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Howard
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc., Mid-Century Insurance Company, Gregory Scher, Wolls Peer Dollinger & Sher and Kimberly Haskins
Case Number: 5:2018cv04011
Filed: February 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Farmers and Mid-Century's Motion to Dismiss 24 is granted. Counts One, Three, Four, and Five against Farmers and Mid-Century are dismissed with prejudice and Count Two against Farmers and Mid-Century is dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Scher and WPDS's Motion to Dismiss Action 26 is granted. Count Five against Mr. Scher and WPDS is dismissed without prejudice. Mr. Howard's Count Five claim against Ms. Haskins is dismissed without prejudice for failure to complete service of process and failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/23/2019. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Howard by regular mail. (mls)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See Order for details. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms for all named defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d), to be served at no cost to Plaintiff abse nt a finding by the Court that Plaintiff is able to pay such costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/6/18.Mailed to pro se party Derrick Howard, and to the Finance Office at Coleman II U.S. Penitentiary in Coleman, Florida by regular mail. (adc)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Derrick Howard is ordered to show cause in writing to the undersigned, on or before June 25, 2018 why she should not recommend to the District Judge that his claims be dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) f or his failure to pay the initial partial filing fee as previously ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/23/18. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Howard, 24997-044, COLEMAN II - USP, U.S. Penitentiary Inmate Mail/Parcels, PO Box 1034, Coleman, FL 33521 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3702. (adc)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER taking under advisement 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, pending Plaintiff's submission of an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall submit an initial partial filing fee of $2.50 to the clerk of the court on or before 5/18/18. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/13/18. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Howard by regular mail. (adc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolls Peer Dollinger & Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?