Hruska v. General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin

Plaintiff: Ray Hruska
Defendant: General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin
Case Number: 5:2018cv04073
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Allen
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Derek H. Mackay (Mackay, Derek)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aa)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 1:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/1/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/27/18. All participants must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference (ss)
July 27, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin.(Mackay, Derek)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Allison L. Greenfield on behalf of General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin. (Greenfield, Allison)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin identifying QBE Insurance Group Limited as corporate parent . (Mackay, Derek)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Saline County, Kansas, case number 2018-cv-000128-CO Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4541621.), filed by General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Records State Court File, #3 Ex A)(Mackay, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hruska v. General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Casualty Co. of Wisconsin
Represented By: Derek H. Mackay
Represented By: Allison L. Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Hruska
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?