Antrim v. Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York

Plaintiff: Justin Antrim
Defendant: Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 5:2018cv04092
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Sam A Crow
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The undersigned Magistrate Judge communicated to counsel, via letter dated October 9, 2018, regarding deferred scheduling of this case. Having received affirmative responses from the parties, the initial order and scheduling in this case shall be deferred pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 7). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/10/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(rel)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York identifying Independence Holding Company as corporate parent . (Haley, Lauren)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Individual Application)(Haley, Lauren)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York (Haley, Lauren)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York shall have until 10/3/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/21/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Haley, Lauren)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Justin Antrim upon Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018 (Michel, Larry)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 8/29/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(msb)
August 24, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York by serving the Kansas Insurance Commissioner. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Justin Antrim. (Michel, Larry)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4565737.), filed by Justin Antrim.(Michel, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antrim v. Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Security Life Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Karrie J. Clinkinbeard
Represented By: Lauren K Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Antrim
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?