Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc.
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv04107
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant. Defendant is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including November 13, 2018, in which to serve its responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant, First Request for Admissions to Defendant, and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Skidgel, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/24/2018. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CHANGING TIME OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference is re-set for 10/24/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Protective Order and entering Protective Order limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/2/2018. (ts)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Martin, Coy)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Martin, Coy)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. of Discovery Requests (Martin, Coy)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean P. O'Connor for Continental Western Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin F. Amatuzio for Continental Western Insurance Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/20/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Sean P. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4587616.) by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Pro Hac Motion, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Skidgel, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #3 Corrected Main Document) (ht).
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Kevin F. Amatuzio to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4587548.) by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Pro Hac Motion, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Skidgel, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #3 Corrected Main Document) (ht).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/7/2018. (ts)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. . (Martin, Coy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Western Insurance Company.(Skidgel, Michael)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Western Insurance Company identifying W.R. Berkley Corporation as corporate parent . (Skidgel, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company - trial to be held in Topeka. (Skidgel, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company. (Skidgel, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mitchell County, Kansas, case number 2018-CV-000016 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4571824.), filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Skidgel, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc. v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Skidgel
Represented By: Kevin D. Case
Represented By: Sean P. O'Connor
Represented By: Kevin F. Amatuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Valley Building Center, Inc.
Represented By: Coy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?