United States of America v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ulysses J.A. Clark and Sandra D. Clark
Case Number: 5:2018cv04110
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 AGREED ORDER OF JUDGMENT ENTERED: See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/30/18. (msb)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandra D. Clark, Ulysses J.A. Clark.(Knopp, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by D. Brad Bailey and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Tanya S. Wilson on behalf of United States of America (Wilson, Tanya)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Bailey, D.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Bailey, D.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement)(Bailey, D.)
September 4, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulysses J.A. Clark
Represented By: Joseph A. Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra D. Clark
Represented By: Joseph A. Knopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: D. Brad Bailey
Represented By: Tanya S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?