United States of America v. Jacobs

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tiffanie M. Jacobs
Case Number: 5:2018cv04131
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Sam A Crow
1 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Tiffanie M. Jacobs waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Wilson, Tanya)
October 12, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Wilson, Tanya)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
October 11, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wilson, Tanya)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Reamortization)(Wilson, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffanie M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tanya S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?