United States of America v. Crowley et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Unknown Spouse, if any, of Caroline Crawley, Caroline Crowley and Ally Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04132
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
1 Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #6 Motion for Service by publication on the Unknown Spouse, if any, of Caroline Crowley. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/30/18. (adc)
November 29, 2018 6 MOTION for Service by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sinclair, Luke)
November 29, 2018 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon Ally Financial, Inc. served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018 (Sinclair, Luke)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ally Financial, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
November 13, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Caroline Crowley waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Sinclair, Luke)
October 12, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service by United States of America (Sinclair, Luke)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
October 11, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sinclair, Luke)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage)(Sinclair, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crowley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Spouse, if any, of Caroline Crawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Luke P. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?