United States of America v. Board et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ashley Renee Board, Adrian Michael Board and Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of such of the deceased borrower and Defendants; the Unknown Spouses of the deceased borrower and other
Case Number: 5:2018cv04134
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE by United States of America of Notice of Suit (Attachments: #1 Notice of Suit)(Wilson, Tanya)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION ON DEFENDANTS ADRIAN MICHAEL BOARD, ASHLEY RENEE BOARD, AND THE UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS re: #4 Motion for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/15/2018. (hl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wilson, Tanya)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Jackie A. Rapstine and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Tanya S. Wilson on behalf of United States of America (Wilson, Tanya)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rapstine, Jackie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Rapstine, Jackie)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Renee Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Michael Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of such of the deceased borrower and Defendants; the Unknown Spouses of the deceased borrower and other
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jackie A. Rapstine
Represented By: Tanya S. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?